U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00294
  • Case Name: Ash v. Chobani, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • January 22, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 22, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • January 22, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 28, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 27, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.