U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Huitran-Barron v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 06, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • July 17, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.