U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00301
  • Case Name: Livefree Emergency Response, Inc. v. Mey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 13, 2017: [Transfer Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 18, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.