U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00304
  • Case Name: Lapin v. Widmyer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Joinder]
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Statement]
  • July 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • July 06, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Statement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • June 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 01, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • December 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 06, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • October 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 05, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • August 17, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • August 08, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.