U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Tibbitts v. Armstrong
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Reconsideration]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 13, 2019: [Leave to Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Receipt]
  • September 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.