U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Dome Technology, LLC v. Monolithic Constructors, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2019: [Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • August 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 01, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 01, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • October 18, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.