U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Ray v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Return Mail]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 23, 2017: [Waiver]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.