U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00266
  • Case Name: In Re: Grimmett
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • October 05, 2017: [Appellees Brief]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Appellants Brief]
  • August 10, 2017: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • August 10, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2017: [Designations of Record]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 28, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.