U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00312
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Regli et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order of Sale]
  • July 02, 2018: [Praecipe]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 12, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 22, 2018: [Disclaimer]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • October 04, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Disclaimer]
  • August 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2017: [Litigation Order]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.