U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Haas v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 28, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 27, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.