U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Paddock v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 09, 2018: [Substitute Party]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Supplement]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 23, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 23, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Complaint]
  • July 28, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.