U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00315
  • Case Name: PDT Original Designs, LLC v. Hangemright.com, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2019: [Litigation Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2018: [Markman Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 13, 2018: [Response (generic)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 26, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 14, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2017: [Counterclaim]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 08, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 02, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.