U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Holder v. Russo Brothers Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 12, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 03, 2017: [Consent Filed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.