U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00316
  • Case Name: Engineering/Remediation Resources Group, Inc. v. Performance Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Writ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Writ]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Default Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 06, 2018: [Entry of Default]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • December 11, 2017: [Bond]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Writ Returned]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • September 21, 2017: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 07, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Issuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 02, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.