U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00319
  • Case Name: McGonigal v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • November 17, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Supplement]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 29, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 29, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 03, 2017: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • August 03, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • August 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.