U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00324
  • Case Name: Provost et al v. Kootenai County Water District No. 1
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.