U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00322
  • Case Name: Lafferty v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 02, 2018: [Disclosure]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • September 11, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 04, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 04, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.