U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00321
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order CTO]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 03, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 03, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 04, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 04, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.