U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 16, 2018: [Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Consent Filed]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 17, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 17, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 04, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.