U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Mora v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • November 07, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 07, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 04, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 04, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.