U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00328
  • Case Name: Wilkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • November 06, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 08, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 07, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.