U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Willard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 10, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 21, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 13, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 13, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.