U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Blair v. Radial First Cardiovascular Associates, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 10, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 05, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 08, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.