U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00170
  • Case Name: F.V. v. Barron et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 16, 2020: [Expedite]
  • April 16, 2020: [Clarify]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Supplement]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Statement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.