U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Miller et al v. The State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 19, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2017: [Receipt]
  • August 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.