U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Sivo v. Benewah County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 09, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.