U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00333
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Vacate]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Vacate]
  • November 21, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 01, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 14, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.