U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00332
  • Case Name: MBallantyne LLC et al v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • August 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.