U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00334
  • Case Name: Spaude v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 11, 2017: [Complaint]
  • August 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.