U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Butler v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 16, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Complaint]
  • August 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.