U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00336
  • Case Name: U.S. Bank National Association v. Briscoe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 08, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2017: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.