U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00335
  • Case Name: Maple et al v. Rainbow's End Recovery Center, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.