U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00337
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Field et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Strike]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • March 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2019: [Declaration]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Receipt]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Request]
  • September 13, 2018: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 31, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Request]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • August 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.