U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00338
  • Case Name: Vincent Farms, Inc. v. Syngenta Seeds, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • February 01, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 02, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 18, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2017: [Strike]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 15, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Transfer Case]
  • August 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 16, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 16, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.