U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Tindore et al v. Trugreen Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 29, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 01, 2017: [Litigation Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Remand]
  • October 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 06, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.