U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Chatterton v. 104.1 Radio Station et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 07, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.