U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Thornton v. Pandrea et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 15, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 01, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Quash]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.