U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00361
  • Case Name: DeVan v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.