U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00364
  • Case Name: Charboneau v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2020: [Request]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 19, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Request]
  • April 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • February 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Reopening Case]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.