U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00369
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Trust Financial, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
  • November 07, 2017: [Judgment Offer Accepted (Notice of Acceptance)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 31, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 27, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 23, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.