U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00372
  • Case Name: Palmer v. Wagner Spray Tech Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Protective Order]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 17, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • November 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 13, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Joinder]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 07, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • September 06, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.