U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00373
  • Case Name: Hogue v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Renew]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Renew]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Disqualify Judge]
  • April 01, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Request]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2019: [Compel]
  • February 21, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Strike]
  • December 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Stay]
  • November 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 14, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • September 07, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.