U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00376
  • Case Name: Winter Wildlands Alliance et al v. U.S. Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 15, 2017: [Stay]
  • December 05, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 04, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 24, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 08, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.