U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00381
  • Case Name: Czapiewski v. Airgas US, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 18, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 04, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Litigation Order]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 13, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.