U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Receipt]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 02, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • December 18, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 12, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 11, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.