U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00360
  • Case Name: Hetemi v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 12, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Complaint]
  • September 12, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.