U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00382
  • Case Name: In Re: Lapham
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Appellants Reply Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [Appellees Brief]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2018: [Excerpt of Record]
  • February 05, 2018: [Appellants Brief]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2017: [Designations of Record]
  • December 22, 2017: [Certificate of Readiness]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.