U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Lonkey v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • May 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Return Mail]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Consent Filed]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 13, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.