U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Stephens et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Certificate of Record on Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 03, 2018: [Statement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 28, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 25, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 16, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Errata]
  • November 21, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 15, 2017: [Errata]
  • November 14, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.