U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00384
  • Case Name: Cox et al v. CertainTeed Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • December 21, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Errata]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Errata]
  • September 19, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.